Financial history SOUTHGATE SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1122087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2018 04/04/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £11.67k £14.74k £12.39k £3.03k £11.02k
Total expenditure £11.58k £12.84k £7.16k £12.38k £12.58k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A