Accounts and annual returns SOHAM COMMUNITY HALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1120336
Charity reporting is overdue by 1687 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 226 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 226 days
Annual return 31 January 2022 Overdue Overdue by 591 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Overdue Overdue by 591 days
Annual return 31 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 956 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 956 days
Annual return 31 January 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1321 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1321 days
Annual return 31 January 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1687 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1687 days