Accounts and annual returns GUSSAGE ST MICHAEL COMMUNITY HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1120426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 17 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 17 March 2022 198 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 14 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 01 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 18 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required