Financial history GUSSAGE ST MICHAEL COMMUNITY HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1120426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £5.93k £5.11k £5.27k £12.38k £18.03k
Total expenditure £4.25k £9.13k £4.75k £3.61k £3.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k £17.43k