HOMENETMEN LONDON

Charity number: 1121998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 21 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 21 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 30 September 2020 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 30 September 2020 30 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 13 July 2020 317 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 07 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 03 September 2018 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 26 September 2017 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 July 2017 On time Download