CLEFT

Charity number: 1119630
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £72.43k £260.60k £106.95k £180.10k £89.19k
Total expenditure £63.53k £139.38k £133.50k £163.63k £67.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A