Accounts and annual returns UK Music Masters Ltd.

Charity number: 1119372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 13 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 13 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 09 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 04 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 16 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 16 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 30 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window