Trustees UK Music Masters Ltd.

Charity number: 1119372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIMON VINCENT FREAKLEY Chair 18 June 2012
None on record
Charlotte Alicia Swannell Trustee 08 June 2022
None on record
Stuart Graeme Mason Trustee 22 March 2021
THE NOTTINGHAM YOUTH ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
Dr Gwyneth Kadiatu Kanneh Trustee 22 March 2021
None on record
Dr Steven Berryman Trustee 23 October 2020
THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF EDUCATIONAL ASSESSORS
Received: On time
THE CHARTERED COLLEGE OF TEACHING
Received: On time
THE BERKELEY ENSEMBLE
Received: On time
SPITALFIELDS FESTIVAL LIMITED
Received: On time
Mary Rebekah Kofokasumu Trustee 21 May 2020
PEUT-ETRE THEATRE LIMITED
Received: On time
James Anthony Mark JOSEPH Trustee 05 December 2019
None on record
Sarah Serena Bunting Trustee 27 June 2019
None on record
Anna Carrington Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Philippa Thomas Trustee 01 February 2018
None on record
Talia Sarah Hull Trustee 12 September 2017
None on record
PHILIP KELLER Trustee 17 June 2015
NORTHERN BALLET LIMITED
Received: On time
John Denis Nickson Trustee 16 May 2013
THE BEACON FELLOWSHIP CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Lady Victoria Susan Hull Robey Trustee
ROYAL PHILHARMONIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
BRAMFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
GLYNDEBOURNE PRODUCTIONS LIMITED
Received: On time