BRITISH EARTHQUAKE AND TSUNAMI SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help victims of earthquakes and/or tsunamis in Indonesia and elsewhere.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Indonesia
- Philippines
Governance
- 31 December 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Page | Chair | 22 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
Theodore Michael David Lane | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian Phillips | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Lewis Fair | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Andrew Watt | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Agnes Hooper | Trustee | 22 April 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.74k | £95.76k | £95.09k | £86.56k | £97.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.15k | £95.61k | £93.87k | £85.33k | £99.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 APRIL 2007.
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF EARTHQUAKES/TSUNAMIS. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN AREAS AFFECTED BY EARTHQUAKES/TSUNAMIS. 3) TO PROMOTE GENERAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF DEPRIVATION AFFECTED BY EARTHQUAKES/TSUNAMIS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 ARNOLD WAY
BOSHAM
CHICHESTER
PO18 8NJ
- Phone:
- 07940 454420
- Email:
- beatscharity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window