SKIDDAW HOUSE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1119402
Charity reporting is overdue by 35 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 35 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 35 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 December 2020 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 November 2018 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required