THE SEBASTIAN HUNTER MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1119191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 March 2020 14 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2020 14 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 25 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 25 March 2018 23 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2018 23 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 25 March 2017 09 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2017 09 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 25 March 2016 27 January 2017 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2016 27 January 2017 2 days late Download