THE ASHBEACH LADYBIRDS PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1120168
Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 86 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 86 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 04 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 17 July 2019 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 17 July 2019 17 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 02 August 2018 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 02 August 2018 33 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 08 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 08 May 2017 On time Download