THE ASHBEACH LADYBIRDS PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1120168
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Catriona Hawes Trustee 15 October 2018
ASHBEACH LADYBIRDS PRE-SCHOOL Overdue by 90 days
Rucksanna Webb Trustee 03 October 2019 None on record
Emma Hinde Trustee 04 March 2019
ASHBEACH LADYBIRDS PRE-SCHOOL Overdue by 90 days
Amie Linsdell Trustee 15 October 2018
ASHBEACH LADYBIRDS PRE-SCHOOL Overdue by 90 days
Sarah Griffiths Trustee 19 November 2018
ASHBEACH LADYBIRDS PRE-SCHOOL Overdue by 90 days
Hayley Pepper Trustee 07 October 2019
ASHBEACH LADYBIRDS PRE-SCHOOL Overdue by 90 days
Laura Charles Trustee 15 October 2018
RAMSEY HEIGHTS COMMUNITY TRUST Received: On time
David Manning Trustee 02 March 2020 None on record