Financial history READING PRIDE

Charity number: 1119891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £33.25k £51.32k £65.91k £23.37k £74.97k
Total expenditure £25.74k £41.46k £56.46k £2.51k £70.39k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A