Trustees READING PRIDE

Charity number: 1119891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL BRITT Chair 20 January 2014
None on record
Sophia James Trustee 31 May 2018
None on record
SARAH HACKER Trustee 31 May 2018
None on record
Michael Russell Trustee 27 March 2017
None on record
Kirsten Ruth Bayes Trustee 11 April 2016
None on record
ANDREW TIMOTHY ADAMS Trustee 15 November 2012
None on record