VALAN SOCIAL WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1119218
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 30 April 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 30 April 2021 30 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 29 June 2020 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 29 June 2020 90 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 01 November 2019 215 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 01 November 2019 215 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 24 July 2018 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 24 July 2018 115 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 21 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 21 March 2017 On time Download