BRITISH SOCIETY FOR HISTOCOMPATIBILITY AND IMMUNOGENETICS

Charity number: 1123760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 27 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 28 June 2016 On time Download