BRITISH SOCIETY FOR HISTOCOMPATIBILITY AND IMMUNOGENETICS

Charity number: 1123760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Robinson Trustee 05 September 2013 None on record
ARTHI ANAND Trustee None on record
Dr DAVID TURNER Trustee 07 March 2012 None on record
JOHN SMITH Trustee 26 September 2013 None on record
RICHARD BATTLE Trustee 31 May 2012 None on record
DEBORAH LOUISE PRITCHARD Trustee 07 March 2012 None on record
ELIZABETH ALICE WROE Trustee 30 September 2014 None on record
DEBORAH SAGE Trustee 30 September 2014 None on record
BRENDAN CLARK BPAG CHAIR Trustee 01 January 2014 None on record
Dr KAY POULTON Trustee 07 March 2012 None on record