KLSA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1119224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £37.50k £87.50k £14.96k £37.50k £47.19k
Total expenditure £31.28k £73.15k £570 £66.98k £45.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A