FOUNDATION FOR INTEGRATION OF COMMUNITIES (FICO)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Governance
- 02 November 2007: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 13 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY RESOURCE FOR ETHNIC MINORITIES, REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS LIVING IN WIGAN BOROUGH AND THE GREATER MANCHESTER AREA. IN PROVIDING THE COMMUNITY RESOURCE FOUNDATION FOR INTEGRATION OF COMMUNITY WILL PAY PARTICULAR ATTENTION TO THE NEEDS OF THE DISABLED, LONE MOTHERS, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS. FOUNDATION FOR INTEGRATION OF COMMUNITIES AIMS TO PROVIDE COMMUNITY RESOURCE IN THE FOLLOWING AREAS OF LIFE: A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; B) ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING; C) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; D) THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH; E) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; F) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY RAISING AWARENESS OF ASPECTS OF DISCRIMINATION AFFECTING THE COMMUNITY BY ALL MEANS OF COMMUNICATIONS, INCLUDING DIVERSITY FORUMS AND G) TO OTHERWISE DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED MEMBERS OF THAT COMMUNITY IN SUCH AWAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window