SRI GANGAMATA GAUDIYA MATH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a spiritual, cultural community centre with weekly programs covering two main themes: Education and Healthy Living. Education: - educative and informative workshops on ancient Vedic wisdom - music workshops - art workshops - children workshop Healthy Living: - cooking courses - food distribution - yoga courses - meditation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LY LUFT | Chair | 01 June 2006 |
|
|
||||
Tarcisio Piucco | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
DENISE ANGELA MCFARLAND | Trustee | 15 August 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.34k | £166.84k | £212.72k | £209.37k | £367.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.76k | £89.26k | £155.96k | £125.50k | £182.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.08k | £49.29k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JANUARY 2008 AS AMENDED 1 SEPTEMBER 2010. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 10 JUN 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A SPIRITUAL AND CULTURAL COMMUNITY CENTRE, IN ORDER TO ADVANCE AND IMPROVE COMMUNITY INVOLVEMENT (DIFFERENT AGE GROUPS AND CULTURAL BACKGROUNDS ETC), WITH THE AIMS OF PROMOTING HARMONY AND RESPECT BASED ON A SPIRITUAL UNDERSTANDING AND REALISING ONE’S ETERNAL RELATIONSHIP WITH GOD. TO PROMOTE A POSITIVE CONSCIOUSNESS THROUGH HEALTHY LIVING WORKSHOPS AND EDUCATIONAL COURSES ON VEDIC PHILOSOPHY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE: LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
631 FOREST ROAD
LONDON
E17 4NE
- Phone:
- 02082578406
- Email:
- gangamatajis@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window