BROWNHILLS AND WALSALL WOOD FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1123463
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 March 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 07 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 January 2017 On time Download