BROWNHILLS AND WALSALL WOOD FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1123463
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £25.04k £27.31k £22.72k £22.72k £23.17k
Total expenditure £39.91k £41.32k £37.34k £30.27k £32.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A