REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD (RCCG) HOLY GHOST ZONE COVENTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AT THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 January 2009: Standard registration
- 09 December 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 April 2013: Re-registered
- 09 September 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 15 December 2014: Re-registered
- 16 June 2016: Funds received from 1110324 REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD HOLY GHOST ZONE (...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Olajide | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
OLADIPO AJAYI | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £334.24k | £157.96k | £290.40k | £341.81k | £428.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.96k | £143.76k | £153.53k | £234.99k | £318.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 13 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 13 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 May 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 04 May 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 DEC 2006
Charitable objects
* TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST, THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, EVANGELISM, DISTRIBUTING OF LITERATURE AND TRACTS, BROADCASTING AND SUCH CHARITALE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE * THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE THE OBJECTS TO BE CARRIED OUT AS A PROCLAMATION FOR THE BELIEFS SET OUT IN CLAUSE 22 OF THE ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holy Ghost Zone
8 Albert Street
COVENTRY
CV1 5HA
- Phone:
- 02476680039
- Email:
- ADM.HOLYGHOSTZONE@YAHOO.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window