CHRISTIAN NURSES AND MIDWIVES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the charity has no current activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cardiff
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 June 2007: Standard registration
- 18 May 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 18 May 2016: Funds transferred to 1131658 CHRISTIAN MEDICAL FELLOWSHIP
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.83k | £34.07k | £16.00k | £5.62k | £1.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.73k | £4.63k | £17.20k | £25.84k | £4.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 20 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 20 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 18 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/02/2007 AS AMENDED ON 06/07/2013
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY:- A) ENCOURAGING CHRISTIAN NURSES TO GROW IN THE KNOWLEDGE OF CHRIST AND TO MAKE HIM KNOWN B) PROMOTING CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES WITHIN NURSING C) DEVELOPING A NETWORK OF CHRISTIAN NURSES FOR FELLOWSHIP AND PRAYER D) STRENGTHENING AND SUPPORTING CHRISTIAN STUDENT NURSES AND MIDWIVES E) SUPPORTING THE WORK OF NURSING AND MIDWIFERY MISSIONARIES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD WHO ARE IN AGREEMENT WITH OUR DOCTRINAL BASIS AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window