Trustees THE LAMBETH CONFERENCE

Charity number: 1121679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LORD STEPHEN KEITH GREEN Chair 12 October 2017
THE ARCHBISHOP OF CANTERBURY'S ANGLICAN COMMUNION FUND
Received: On time
ASIA HOUSE
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF THE ARCHBISHOP OF CANTERBURY'S ANGLICAN COMMUNION FUND
Received: On time
THE BISHOP RADFORD TRUST
Received: On time
ROLAND DACRE RUDD Trustee 01 January 2021
SPEAKERS FOR SCHOOLS
Received: On time
MILLFIELD
Received: 11 days late
The Rt Revd Dr Emma Ineson Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Adebimpe Nkontchou Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Carl David Hughes Trustee 07 June 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS WITH HOLY TRINITY, WANDSWORTH
Received: On time
PREMIER CHRISTIAN MEDIA TRUST
Received: On time
THE EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP IN THE ANGLICAN COMMUNION
Received: On time
CHURCH ESTATES CHARITY
Received: On time
Julian Victor frow Roberts Trustee 12 October 2017
THE ARCHBISHOP OF CANTERBURY'S ANGLICAN COMMUNION FUND
Received: On time
Rt Rev Tim Thornton Trustee 12 October 2017
None on record
CHRISTOPHER QUENTIN LAWRENCE Trustee 12 October 2017
None on record
Beverly Gail Jullien Trustee 12 October 2017
None on record
The Most Rev Josiah Idowu-Fearon Trustee 01 July 2015
None on record
Professor Michael Wright Trustee 15 October 2012
None on record