Financial history VISION REDBRIDGE CULTURE AND LEISURE

Charity number: 1122720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £20.19m £19.45m £20.06m £19.17m £31.36m
Total expenditure £21.33m £20.98m £21.10m £18.80m £22.21m
Income from government contracts £9.86m £9.80m £9.79m £9.32m £9.06m
Income from government grants £923.00k £668.00k £845.00k £5.79m £3.10m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £20.18m £19.45m £20.05m £19.17m £21.66m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.00k £5.00k £9.00k £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £9.70m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £21.33m £20.98m £21.10m £18.80m £22.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £108.00k £107.00k £84.00k £91.00k £96.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £23.00k £16.00k £16.00k £32.00k £50.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0