Cricketers' Trust Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the relief of physical and mental illness and disability, addictions and hardship of both men and women who are involved or were formally involved in the playing of cricket professionally in England and Wales (members of the Professional Cricketers' Association) and their dependants who, for whatever reason, are in need of such relief.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 July 2007: Standard registration
- 12 April 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 05 July 2011: Re-registered
- 13 November 2013: Funds received from 286742 THE PROFESSIONAL CRICKETERS ASSOCIATION CHARITY
- PCA BENEVOLENT FUND LTD (Previous name)
- PROFESSIONAL CRICKETERS TRUST LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID FORD | Chair | 05 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Hannon-Dalby | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Kent | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chetan Patel | Trustee | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daryl Mitchell | Trustee | 21 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Thomas | Trustee | 02 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Trescothick MBE | Trustee | 16 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY DAVIES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £395.05k | £125.50k | £463.54k | £380.88k | £417.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £404.47k | £278.42k | £285.58k | £332.48k | £351.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 MAY 2007. AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29 AUG 2018 as amended on 22 Jan 2020 as amended on 13 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
• To promote the relief of physical and mental illness and disability, addictions and hardship of both men and women who are involved or were formally involved in the playing of cricket professionally in England and Wales (members of the Professional Cricketers Association) and their dependants who, for whatever reason, are in need of such relief; • To provide mental health education and addiction awareness for all past and present PCA members; further, to create roles to educate and bring awareness of such matters to adults and children in the wider general public; • To advance education and personal development opportunities for all past and present members; • To promote physical education, health and the game of cricket generally to adults and children as a recreational sport.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 BRASSEY ROAD
OLD POTTS WAY
SHREWSBURY
SHROPSHIRE
SY3 7FA
- Phone:
- 01743241281
- Email:
- ithomas@thepca.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window