GARGRAVE AGRICULTURAL AND HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY LTD

Charity number: 1121555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time Download