Accounts and annual returns The Five Islands Academy PTFA

Charity number: 1119793
Charity reporting is overdue by 87 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 87 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 87 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 21 August 2020 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 07 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 05 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required