EASEBOURNE TRUST

Charity number: 1120615
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.39k £6.33k £5.43k £5.05k £5.76k
Total expenditure £10.64k £6.45k £7.80k £11.44k £8.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A