Accounts and annual returns BOLTON COMMUNITY EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1121996
Charity reporting is up to date (34 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 March 2022 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 March 2022 34 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 April 2021 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 April 2021 70 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 March 2020 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 15 March 2020 44 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 March 2019 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 March 2019 51 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 March 2018 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 March 2018 51 days late Download Open in new window