Financial history BOLTON COMMUNITY EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1121996
Charity reporting is up to date (34 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £43.38k £49.63k £70.52k £71.87k £100.55k
Total expenditure £21.29k £29.72k £68.08k £43.50k £51.18k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A