HOPE 4 KIDZ

Charity number: 1121326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 31 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 31 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 18 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 18 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 26 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 26 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 27 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 21 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 February 2017 On time Download