HOPE 4 KIDZ

Charity number: 1121326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £157.50k £220.96k £153.81k £204.17k £134.63k
Total expenditure £82.55k £196.36k £80.40k £106.81k £67.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A