Trustees HOPE 4 KIDZ

Charity number: 1121326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lindsey Green Trustee 13 June 2023
None on record
Jason Christopher Devison Trustee 12 February 2023
None on record
Penny Jones Trustee 30 November 2022
None on record
Deborah Jones Trustee 30 November 2022
None on record
Natalie Baldry Trustee 16 February 2018
GRANDPARENTS PLUS
Received: 132 days late
Darren Stephen Cliff Trustee 21 April 2017
None on record
Sharon Theresa Downey Trustee 01 February 2016
None on record
SUE Trustee
None on record