CHELSEA ACADEMY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to support Chelsea Academy in creating an inspirational community of learning and achievement that will make a positive contribution to community cohesion in Kensington and Chelsea.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 06 September 2007: Standard registration
- 25 June 2012: Funds received from 312381 THE WILLIAM PETYT FOUNDATION
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Megan Ouchterloney | Chair | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Deji Adewoye | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andreja Lazic | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Oyogoa | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mariana Luxardo | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zehra Imam-Sadeque | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Filippo Lanza | Trustee | 15 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Rosa Casado | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Astrid Birgitte Nellemann | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.96k | £227.33k | £208.42k | £234.32k | £195.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.49k | £75.00k | £104.87k | £157.13k | £228.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 July 2020 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 07 July 2020 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 AUGUST 2007.
Charitable objects
THE SUPPORT OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES WHICH PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT CHELSEA ACADEMY, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES AND THE FUNDING OF CAPITAL PROJECTS CONNECTED TO CHELSEA ACADEMY.
Area of benefit
CHELSEA ACADEMY
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHELSEA ACADEMY
LOTS ROAD
LONDON
SW10 0AB
- Phone:
- 02073763019
- Email:
- caf@chelsea-academy.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window