TUNBRIDGE WELLS GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR BOYS SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1119646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 11 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 09 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 11 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 06 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 06 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 21 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 21 March 2017 On time Download