TUNBRIDGE WELLS GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR BOYS SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1119646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £592.81k £669.88k £578.44k £537.58k £416.86k
Total expenditure £479.22k £581.59k £562.96k £475.11k £306.49k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £48.67k £183.31k £60.44k £59.37k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £32.16k £6.74k £15.02k £53.02k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £507.76k £478.63k £501.94k £423.73k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £1.44k £812 £703 £1.45k N/A
Income - Other £2.79k £386 £335 £10 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £125.36k £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £465.07k £576.38k £555.63k £471.05k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £574 £4.77k £7.33k £3.82k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £6.31k £9.05k £5.75k £7.35k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £13.58k £437 £0 £239 N/A