TEMPLE HILL COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1120292
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 18 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 18 October 2021 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 04 September 2020 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 04 September 2020 402 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 09 October 2019 436 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required