BH ISLAMIC CENTRE LONDON

Charity number: 1121087
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 March 2021 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 March 2021 39 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 March 2020 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 March 2020 59 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 February 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 February 2019 1 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 March 2018 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 26 March 2018 54 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 12 April 2017 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 12 April 2017 71 days late Download