BH ISLAMIC CENTRE LONDON

Charity number: 1121087
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £114.00k £121.39k £121.39k £101.52k £113.34k
Total expenditure £98.07k £109.32k £109.32k £95.37k £104.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A