Trustees THE NATIONAL CHURCHES TRUST

Charity number: 1119845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LUKE MARCH Chair 18 April 2013
WESSEX MEDICAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE SALISBURY CATHEDRAL GIRL CHORISTERS' FUND
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE WOODFORD VALLEY WITH ARCHERS GATE
Recently registered
NIGEL HUGH WALTER Trustee 16 December 2021
Cogwheel Counselling
Received: On time
Dr Robert David Muir Trustee 16 December 2021
BIAPT (BRITISH AND IRISH ASSOCIATION FOR PRACTICAL THEOLOGY)
Received: On time
THE WHITELANDS COLLEGE GUILD OF ST URSULA
Received: On time
THE SOCIETY FOR PROMOTING CHRISTIAN KNOWLEDGE
Received: On time
GERALD MICHAEL NOLAN CORBETT Trustee 16 December 2021
THE CORBETT FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Sarah Lesley Stewart OBE DL Trustee 16 December 2021
THE BEAMISH DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Shirley Adams JP Trustee 12 March 2019
MANCHESTER RELIEF IN NEED CIO
Recently registered
Henry Julian Aglionby Stanford Trustee 12 March 2019
None on record
Catherine Donna McDonald Trustee 12 December 2018
LANDMARK ARTS CENTRE
Received: On time
Catherine Marie Pepinster Trustee 17 October 2018
KALEIDOSCOPE PROJECT
Received: On time
THE BRITISH AND FOREIGN BIBLE SOCIETY
Received: On time
DR Stephen Sklaroff Trustee 28 February 2018
None on record
Rev LUCY WINKETT Trustee 08 March 2017
SOHO CHILD 2000
Received: On time
THE SUITED & BOOTED CENTRE LIMITED
Received: On time
THE QUEEN'S FOUNDATION FOR ECUMENICAL THEOLOGICAL EDUCATION
Received: On time
Sir Paul John James Britton CB CVO Trustee 27 March 2015
THE FRIENDS OF KENT CHURCHES
Received: On time
TONBRIDGE CIVIC SOCIETY
Received: On time