Financial history OLDHAM MADANI ACADEMY

Charity number: 1120937
Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £72.36k £53.72k £18.13k £91.31k £91.38k
Total expenditure £29.36k £26.11k £24.93k £26.16k £23.35k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £16.30k £2.52k