Accounts and annual returns THE ELIZABETH COLLEGE UK FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1120954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 05 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 05 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required