Financial history THE ELIZABETH COLLEGE UK FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1120954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £21.11k £5.05k £18.01k £74.42k £39.59k
Total expenditure £4.20k £21.18k £6.95k £50.10k £32.78k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A