THE CATHARINE MARY SCOTT-SMITH WILL TRUST

Charity number: 1120449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 11 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 11 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 02 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 02 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 19 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 08 May 2019 92 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 26 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 26 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 19 June 2017 134 days late Download