Accounts and annual returns THE AFRICAN CONSERVATION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1120705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 06 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 30 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2019 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 30 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2017 18 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 18 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window