LONDON GOOD NEWS CHURCH LIMITED

Charity number: 1119980
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £17.61k £17.82k £19.71k £19.02k £14.14k
Total expenditure £17.44k £17.82k £20.26k £14.86k £22.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A