THE LACEY THEATRE COMPANY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is a Theatre Company which creates and delivers new works for the general public and schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 December 2007: Standard registration
- 08 February 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2009 | 31/05/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.42k | £48.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.76k | £53.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2010 | 03 February 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2010 | 02 November 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2009 | 24 February 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2009 | 24 February 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 MAY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 22 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TIME THINK FIT; (B) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE ART AND IN PARTICULAR PERFORMING ART FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE DEVELOPMENT PRODUCTION AND PRESENTATION OF NEW WRITING OR WORKS OF ANY FORM AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN YOUNG PERSONS AND ADULTS BY PARTICIPATION IN THE EXPERIENCE OF THEATRE, DRAMA AND THE PERFORMING ARTS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window